WALES PUJA COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's Objects are to increase the awareness of social, cultural & religious values of India amongst the communities we live in by such means as the Trustees shall from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
- India
Governance
- 24 October 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR SHILADITYA SINHA | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DR SAKTI GUHA NIYOGI | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr SATYA KISHORE SHARMA | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR SANKAR DAS | Trustee | 06 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandip Raha | Trustee | 06 November 2011 |
|
|||||
DR RAVINDRA DEVA NARAYAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KANTIMOY NATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ASHOK MUKHERJEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.13k | £4.33k | £12.25k | £30.30k | £22.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.99k | £2.21k | £8.80k | £28.77k | £31.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.90k | £16.06k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 SEP 1995
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
206 Heol Hir
Thornhill
CARDIFF
CF14 9LA
- Phone:
- 07891604247
- Email:
- saktiguha@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window