THE R.L.ST.J.HARMSWORTH MEMORIAL RESEARCH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the research into cancer and rheumatism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LT COL CHARLES VIVIAN CLARKE | Chair | 07 November 2006 |
|
|
||||
Felix James Augustine Clarke | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Paul Anthony Russell | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Timothy Harmsworth | Trustee | 26 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA CHAMBERS | Trustee | 09 February 1997 |
|
|
||||
LORD THOMAS HAROLD RAYMOND HARMSWORTH | Trustee | 03 December 1974 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.77k | £13.59k | £39.04k | £39.04k | £14.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £792 | £792 | £792 | £792 | £1.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 APRIL 1924
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT BY MEANS OF RESEARCH AND OTHERWISE OF THE INVESTIGATION AND SOLUTION OF THE PROBLEM OF THE DISEASES RHEUMATISM AND CANCER, OR EITHER OF THEM AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAWES & CO
BOYCES BUILDING
42 REGENT STREET
CLIFTON
BRISTOL
BS8 4HU
- Phone:
- 01179745221
- Email:
- team@lawes.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window