THE ASSOCIATION OF ACCOUNTING TECHNICIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education and promote the study of the practice, theory and techniques of accountancy and to prevent crime and promote the sound administration of the law for the public benefit by promoting and enforcing standards of professional conduct and monitoring and supervising their compliance with money laundering legislation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£33,509,180
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £32.46m | |
Other trading activities | £510.98k | |
Investments | £35.49k | |
Other | £505.45k |
Total expenditure:
£32,910,880
Raising funds | £290.82k | |
Charitable activities | £32.47m | |
Other | £154.88k |
£1,722,702 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £445.70k | |
Charitable expenditure | £32.47m | |
Retained for future use | £598.30k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £445.70k | |
Charitable expenditure | £32.47m | |
Retained for future use | £2.32m |
People

252 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 22 |
£70k to £80k | 7 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£130k to £140k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bahrain
- Botswana
- Bulgaria
- Burma
- Cayman Islands
- Cyprus
- Eswatini
- Gibraltar
- India
- Ireland
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Malta
- Mauritius
- New Zealand
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Seychelles
- Singapore
- South Africa
- The Gambia
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 15 November 1995: Standard registration
- 04 January 2012: Funds received from 326012 THE ACCOUNTING TECHNICIANS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
- A A T (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
kevin Bragg | Chair | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Burrows FMAAT | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kay Daniels FMAAT | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Susan Boustred FCMI FIOD | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wayne John Cook FMAAT | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Flanagan MAAT | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LUCY COHEN FMAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBEKAH GLOVER FCCA FMAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESCA NATALIA TRICARICO MAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ARGENT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL HARRIS MBA MAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH WALKLETT FMAAT | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Durrell MAAT | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael David Steed | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Anne Marie Moore ACMA | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rita Patel FMAAT | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leonard Donno | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ALICE HILL FMAAT | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN QUIGG BA CA MAAT | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.63m | £29.37m | £32.28m | £32.55m | £33.51m | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.61m | £25.84m | £25.35m | £29.72m | £32.91m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £558.76k | £443.43k | £675.66k | £951.08k | £510.98k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £30.30m | £27.63m | £30.91m | £30.78m | £32.46m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £223.02k | £157.93k | £212.78k | £231.16k | £35.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £546.42k | £1.13m | £480.08k | £586.30k | £505.45k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £29.72m | £25.07m | £24.67m | £28.75m | £32.47m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £190.51k | £212.67k | £240.39k | £252.46k | £290.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £514.20k | £339.43k | £375.81k | £545.16k | £659.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £190.51k | £212.67k | £240.39k | £252.46k | £290.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £701.97k | £555.86k | £446.45k | £711.27k | £154.88k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £818.87k | £1.02m | £4.07m | £6.21m | £5.66m | |
|
Long-term investments | £19.81m | £24.42m | £25.71m | £30.44m | £28.46m | |
|
Other assets | £9.89m | £12.20m | £17.15m | £14.53m | £16.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£741.00k | -£516.00k | £0 | -£878.00k | -£652.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £13.09m | £12.41m | £13.86m | £15.92m | £16.46m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/09/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/05/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAY 2017 as amended on 18 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF THE PRACTICE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES OF ACCOUNTANCY; AND (2)(A) TO PREVENT CRIME; AND (B) TO PROMOTE THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING AND ENFORCING STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AMONGST THOSE ENGAGED IN ACCOUNTANCY AND MONITORING AND SUPERVISING THEIR COMPLIANCE WITH MONEY LAUNDERING LEGISLATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE IN UNITED KINGDOM REPUBLIC OF IRELAND AND OTHER ENGLISH SPEAKING COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Churchill Place
London
E14 5RE
- Phone:
- 02073973052
- Email:
- aat@aat.org.uk
- Website:
-
aat.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window