THE PUTTENHAM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising events to encourage participation in charitable work by the inhabitants of Puttenham and the surrounding area. Make educational grants to local students; Financial aid the elderly and infirm within Puttenham and nearby villages. Maintain and repair St Mary's church and churchyard and Cecilia Hall Puttenham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 23 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVER CHARLES MATTHEWS | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|||||||
TREVOR JOHN WATSON | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Edward George Rutter | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE RUTTER | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
GILLIAN ELAINE BARBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LORRAINE BEVERLEY ELLIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr MALCOLM ERNST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.57k | £55.85k | £53.43k | £65.05k | £85.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.08k | £51.35k | £58.44k | £99.08k | £115.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2023 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 November 2021 | 375 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY CHARITY COMMISSION LETTER DATED 27TH JANUARY 1998 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 18TH MAY 1998.
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PUTTENHAM INCLUDING (A) THE MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCHYARD OF ST MARY PUTTENHAM HERTFORDSHIRE SHOWN EDGE RED ON THE PLAN (B) AS LONG AS THE CHURCH OF ST MARY PUTTENHAM AFORESAID CONTINUES AS A SEPARATE CHURCH TO SERVE THE PARISH OF PUTTENHAM THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR (INCLUDING ANY NECESSARY BUILDING OR REBUILDING) OF THE SAID CHURCH TOGETHER WITH ITS ORNAMENTS AND FURNISHINGS AND ANY ADDITIONS TO THE CHURCH. (C) THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF ST. CECILIA CHURCH HALL PUTTENHAM AFORESAID (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR HARDSHIP ON THE PART OF ANY FAMILY OR PERSONS WHO HAVE BELONGED TO THE CHURCH OF ST. MARY PUTTENHAM FOR A PERIOD OF THREE YEARS IMMEDIATELY BEFOREHAND OR WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE PARISH OF PUTTENHAM FOR SUCH PERIOD. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS LIVING IN THE PARISH AWARDING BURSARIES OR GRANTS FOR EDUCATIONAL OR VOCATIONAL NEEDS INCLUDING THE SUPPLY OF TOOLS, BOOKS, COMPUTERS, PROJECTORS AND OTHER EQUIPMENT PROVIDING THEY HAVE RESIDED IN THE PARISH OF PUTTENHAM FOR A PERIOD OF 3 YEARS IMMEDIATELY BEFOREHAND.
Area of benefit
PUTTENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASTROPE FOLLY
ASTROPE
TRING
HP23 4PN
- Phone:
- 01296668337
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window