Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF MILTON KEYNES CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1051108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 27 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 27 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 20 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 09 May 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 02 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window