Financial history THE CONGLETON TOWN TRUST

Charity number: 1051122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.55k £24.98k £25.91k £28.44k £25.89k
Total expenditure £14.62k £20.16k £32.75k £21.69k £25.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A