Friends of Thornden Wood Primary School

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising events such as fairs,discos and other events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 15 December 1995: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF BRIARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Mason | Chair | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Crocombe | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erin Amanda McIntosh | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Smith | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Georgina Hearnden | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wilson | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lewis | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEANNINE LEE | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Moulton | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carly-Jane Kathro | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.26k | £1.02k | £0 | £1.15k | £6.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.06k | £128 | £128 | £771 | £3.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 October 2023 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2023 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2023 | 626 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 March 2022 | 638 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD NOVEMBER 1995 as amended on 24 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIARY PRIMARY SCHOOL
GREENHILL ROAD
HERNE BAY
CT6 7RS
- Phone:
- 01227373095
- Email:
- friendsofbriary@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window