Governing document GOREFIELD PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 19/05/1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/05/2012 as amended on 21 May 2019 as amended on 17 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF A PLAYING FIELD FOR THE PARISH OF GOREFIELD 2. IF ALL OR PART OF THE TRUST PROPERTY CANNOT BE APPLIED AS ABOVE IT MAY BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR A PLAYING FIELD AND PAVILION FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GOREFIELD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE IN CONNECTION WITH SPORTS AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED -- IN PRACTICE THE PARISH OF GOREFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.