Trustees GOREFIELD PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1051382

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA HOLT | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||
Simon Bramley | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Barry Stanford | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Zarry Parry | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Scott Parry | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Paul Holt | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Stephen Lucas | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kirsty Skinner | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Cara Holt | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Samantha Kublik | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rob Gifford | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Adam Mark Skinner | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kevin Burton | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Nick Turner | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rachael Jay | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM PEGGS | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MICHAEL JOHN HUMPHREY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.