THE SAMSUNG ROYAL BRITISH LEGION, BRITISH KOREAN VETERANS ASSOCIATION SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the educationi of the public by way of scholarships to members, spouses and their decendants of HM Forces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 October 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 December 1995: Standard registration
- 06 August 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 06 August 2015: Funds transferred to 219279 THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION
- THE SAMSUNG ROYAL BRITISH LEGION KOREAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 07/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.08k | £23.67k | £21.63k | £20.45k | £18.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.84k | £67.45k | £13.98k | £38.32k | £36.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 October 2014 | 24 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 October 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 03 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 08 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 13 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1995, AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME SEALED ON 17TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AND RESOLUTION EFFECTIVE 10/2/10
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH A PREFERANCE AS TO NOT MORE THAN 75 PER CENT OF THE ANNUAL INCOME APPLICABLE UNDER SUB-CLAUSE 2.2 ABOVE FOR THOSE MEMBERS AND THEIR SPOUSES AND DESCENDENTS OF HM FORCES WHO HOLD OR ARE ENTITLED TO HOLD THE UNITED NATIONS AND/OR UNITED KINGDOM KOREAN CAMPAIGN MEDAL AND, MEMBERS, SPOUSES AND THEIR DESCENDENTS OF HM FORCES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window