Accounts and annual returns LUPUS UK

Charity number: 1051610
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 November 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 November 2024 8 days late
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 June 2020 On Time