SOCIETY FOR STORYTELLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the knowledge of the art, practice and value of oral storytelling, and in the knowledge of the oral traditions of all the peoples and cultures of the world by actively promoting the exploration and sharing of oral storytelling and stories whether locally, regionally or internationally, formally or informally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 1996: Standard registration
- SFS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Candace Shearer | Chair | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Vaughan | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shane Lewis Ibbs | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Goldspink | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Kevin Daniel | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ronald Coppin | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.81k | £6.79k | £6.58k | £12.40k | £9.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.10k | £11.94k | £8.59k | £4.29k | £5.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 March 2021 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE ART, PRACTICE AND VALUE OF ORAL STORYTELLING AND IN THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE ORAL NARRATIVE TRADITIONS OF ALL THE PEOPLE AND CULTURES OF THE WORLD BY ACTIVELY PROMOTING THE EXPLORATION AND SHARING OF ORAL STORYTELLING AND STORIES WHETHER LOCALLY, REGIONALLY OR INTERNATIONALLY, FORMALLY OR INFORMALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lytchett House
Freeland Park
Wareham Road
POOLE
Dorset
BH16 6FA
- Phone:
- 07480066936
- Email:
- secretary@sfs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window