SOUTH HAMPSTEAD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain a synagogue or synagogues and related community facilities; to advance the education of the public in the Jewish religious and the many facets of the Jewish culture in particular but not exclusively by the provision of lectures and seminars of Jewish history, the Jewish religion, Jewish Philosophy and the Hebrew language ? both modern and biblical
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Howard John Pack | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Danny Kay | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Leon Blitz | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD IAN LOFTUS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JOHN BRYAN AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.03m | £287.99k | £235.48k | £105.69k | £1.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03m | £305.67k | £233.68k | £51.30k | £6.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.03m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.03m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.02m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/01/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 03/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY WORLDWIDE: TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A SYNAGOGUE OR SYNAGOGUES AND RELATED COMMUNITY FACILITIES INCLUDING THE PAYMENT, HIRING AND PENSION OF MINISTERS OF RELIGION AND OTHER PERSONS EMPLOYED FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE PLACE OF WORSHIP AND ITS FACILITIES; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE JEWISH RELIGION AND THE MANY FACETS OF JEWISH CULTURE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES AND SEMINARS OF JEWISH HISTORY, THE JEWISH RELIGION, JEWISH PHILOSOPHY AND HEBREW LANGUAGE – BOTH MODERN AND BIBLICAL
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wilson Wright Llp
5 Fleet Place
LONDON
EC4M 7RD
- Phone:
- 02078320444
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window