Financial history BENTLEY PENTECOSTAL ASSEMBLY OF GOD CHURCH

Charity Number: 1052609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £47.57k £51.92k £39.75k £43.09k £47.11k
Total expenditure £14.63k £24.25k £50.63k £46.98k £42.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A