KINGSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL MUSIC SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to advance public education in music, in particular, to pupils at Kingston Grammar School. Apart from providing refreshments at school concerts, it provides a termly program of musical events. It helps fund musical workshops & individual tuition. It helps to support the KGS Choral Society each Spring and promotes the attendance of concerts through its fund-raising activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 03 February 1996: Standard registration
- 17 June 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1078461 KINGSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.68k | £4.12k | £4.79k | £30 | £2.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £3.58k | £8.50k | £837 | £614 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 September 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 28/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 02/12/1995 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2011 AS AMENDED 08/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR OF PUPILS ATTENDING KINGSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL BY MEANS OF CONCERTS BY PUPILS, PROFESSIONAL CONCERTS FOR PARENTS AND PUPILS, CONCERT VISITS FOR PARENTS AND PUPILS, WORKSHOPS AND MASTER CLASSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window