CLAIRES COURT PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO PUPILS OF CLAIRES COURT & RIDGEWAY SCHOOLS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 15 February 1996: Standard registration
- CLAIRES COURT AND RIDGEWAY PARENTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- CLAIRES COURT AND RIDGEWAY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHYLLIS AVERY MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Simon James Ball | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christina Elizabeth Webster | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felipe Foy | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Sharkey | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
SHEILA HOOKER | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.79k | £38.87k | £30.71k | £139.71k | £170.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.81k | £57.44k | £46.79k | £99.83k | £200.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/11/1996 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/1999 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 25/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 01 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 COLLEGE AVENUE
MAIDENHEAD
BERKS
SL6 6AW
- Phone:
- 01628327362
- Email:
- mkm@clairescourt.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window