THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION - HAMPSHIRE WEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girlguiding Hampshire West, as part of a worldwide organisation, enables girls and young women to fulfil their potential to take an active and responsible role in society through its distinctive, stimulating and enjoyable programme of activities delivered by trained and enthusiastic volunteer leaders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
1000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 February 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Halle | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Margaret Staff | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Margaret Cruse | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Gerrard | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Stoker | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Moody | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Dingley | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Dixon | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Chapman | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Riley | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Alexandra Babbage | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|||||
GEMMA NORTH | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE TREADWELL | Trustee | 05 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.44k | £49.12k | £19.26k | £56.38k | £92.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.50k | £29.12k | £41.98k | £132.13k | £103.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, HAMPSHIRE WEST
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 COMPTON ROAD
TOTTON
SOUTHAMPTON
SO40 3AS
- Phone:
- 02380864728
- Email:
- annbarlow27@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window