NORFOLK ASSOCIATION OF VILLAGE HALLS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of advice,training,and information to Village Halls in Norfolk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 21 February 1996: Standard registration
- 11 May 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 11 May 2017: Funds transferred to 1110817 NORFOLK COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.74k | £3.44k | £2.87k | £2.95k | £1.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.84k | £6.46k | £6.76k | £6.36k | £3.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 04 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 25 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 06 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 03 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 9TH FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES PROVIDING RECREATIONAL FACILITES IN NORFOLK, IN PARTICULAR VILLAGE HALL CHARITIES, IN DIRECT PURSUIT OF THEIR OBJECTIVES BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE TRAINING AND INFORMATION ON EFFICIENT AND PROFESSIONAL MANAGEMENT OF RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window