THE ENTENTE CORDIALE SCHOLARSHIPS TRUST

Charity Number: 1053286
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Gives grants to individuals to study in France

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £14,120

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • France

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1996: Standard registration
  • 03 October 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 03 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1042395 FRANCO-BRITISH COUNCIL - BRITISH SECTION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £70.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £41.28k £85.01k £45.58k £933 £14.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required