GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST KATHERINE

Charity number: 1053294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

a) Preserve and propagate the Christian Faith and Traditions. b) Establish Churches for the worship of the Triune God and Schools for the Greek Orthodox education. c) Undertake charitable work for those who need protection; assistance and medical care; and provide for the welfare of the poor and elderly.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £139,900
Total expenditure: £134,071

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CATHERINE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STELIOS TJIRKALLIS Chair
None on record
Archbishop Nikitas Lioulias Trustee 11 November 2019
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE)
Received: On time
ST BARNABAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY FUND
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF COVENTRY
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CONSTANTINE AND ST HELEN
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF HOLY ANARGYRI TRUST
Received: On time
ST JOHN THE BAPTIST GREEK ORTHODOX TRUST
Received: On time
ST NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX EDUCATIONAL CENTRE
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BRISTOL
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN CHRYSOSTOM IN CHELTENHAM AND ENVIRONS
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Received: 90 days late
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST GEORGE THE MARTYR
Received: On time
Sts. Barbara, Phanourius and Paul the Apostle Greek Orthodox Church
Received: On time
SAINT NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL AND THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Sofoklis Petrides Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
George Loizou Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
Kyriacos Hadjikyricou Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
Michael Yiannaki Trustee 08 April 2017
None on record
ACHILLEAS LAPOURIDES Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
PANTELIS CHARALAMBOUS Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
JOHN BEHIRE Trustee 12 September 2014
None on record
MARIA PAPANICOLAOU Trustee 12 September 2014
None on record
PHILIP SOTERI Trustee 12 July 2011
None on record
GEORGE STRATIS Trustee
None on record
ANTONAKIS NIKOLAS VOUROU Trustee
None on record
THASOS AVRAAMIDES Trustee
None on record
COSTAS PETER CHRISTOU Trustee
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN COMMUNITIES CENTRAL FUND LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £150.82k £123.15k £117.55k £116.45k £139.90k
Total expenditure £149.14k £83.50k £114.05k £130.44k £134.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 March 2022 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 March 2022 145 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 March 2021 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 March 2021 151 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C P CHRISTOU
2ND FLOOR
REGAL HOUSE
1138 HIGH ROAD
WHETSTONE
LONDON
Phone:
02084466777
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available