Financial history COLCHESTER PHOENIX AMATEUR SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1053511
Charity reporting is up to date (147 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £52.29k £24.19k £30.13k £48.71k £32.59k
Total expenditure £45.11k £32.39k £40.29k £56.87k £54.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.67k £2.78k N/A