THE GIBBERD GARDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance of the house and grounds as designed by Sir Frederick Gibberd, opening to the public and the education and promotion of public knowledge and understanding of architecture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Ralph Danvers | Chair | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Marion Ruth Mountsteven | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Antoine Hilton | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Alexander Farningham | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN EVANS | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.39k | £84.16k | £90.03k | £114.09k | £91.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.66k | £64.94k | £86.70k | £93.47k | £107.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.69k | £11.17k | £3.00k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH JUNE 1995. as amended on 19 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND THOSE OF HARLOW AND THE SURRONUDING AREA OF ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE IN PARTICULAR ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") (A) THE MAINTENANCE (SO FAR AS PRACTICAL) OF THE HOUSE AND GROUNDS AS DESIGNED OR LAID OUT BY SIR FEDERICK GIBBERD AND OPENING THEM TO THE PUBLIC (SO FAR AS PRACTICAL); (B) THE PRESERVATION AND PUBLIC DISPLAY (SO FAR AS PRACTICAL) AS THEY WERE ARRANGED BY SIR FREDERICK GIBBERD OF THE WORKS OF ART AND OTHER CHATTELS OF ARTISTIC ORNAMENTAL OR HISTORICAL INTREST CONTAINED OR FORMERLY CONTAINED IN THE HOUSE AND GROUND; (C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND SCHOLARSHIP IN ART ARCHITECTURE PLANNING LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURE OR SUCH OTHER BRANCHES OF LEARNING OR EDUCATION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT; (D) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF ART ARCHITECTURE PLANNING LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURE AND ALLIED SUBJECTS; (E) THE PROVISION OF THE GROUNDS AS A PUBLIC OPEN SPACE.
Area of benefit
HARLOW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The House
Marsh Lane
HARLOW
Essex
CM17 0NA
- Phone:
- 01279442112
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window