GARRETT'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity maintains The Thomas Garrett Heritage Rooms and St Thomas' Chapel of Ease for the benefit of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 16 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Eric Chantler | Chair | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Jane BRISCOE | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Lorna Daphne Brabin-Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas James Eyre | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Georgina Jane Chard | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Dunning | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|||||
CLIVE RONALD OXBY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.08k | £13.87k | £15.97k | £13.24k | £18.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.25k | £7.85k | £16.17k | £19.90k | £9.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.83k | £4.00k | £1.00k | £450 | £900 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24 JULY 1995 as amended on 02 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF ST.JOHN,WASHINGBOROUGH WITH HEIGHINGTON AND CANWICK,AND ALL SAINTS,BRANSTON WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HEIGHINGTON.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Washingborough Road
Heighington
LINCOLN
LN4 1QW
- Phone:
- 01522808051
- Email:
- djchantler@virginmedia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window