SHERWOOD FOREST HOSPITALS GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 1054086

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal objective of the Charity is to provide additional support to the patients of the Sherwood Forest Hospitals NHS Foundation Trust. This is achieved by the prioritisation of needs and the granting of expenditure on items such as refurbishment, medical equipment and staff eduction and welfare.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 2006: Standard registration
  • 14 January 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 14 January 2022: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHERWOOD FOREST HOSPITALS NHS TRUST Trustee 09 July 2002
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £682.00k £451.00k £416.00k £824.77k £638.21k
Total expenditure £842.00k £285.00k £391.00k £303.27k £439.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £632.00k N/A N/A £772.10k £568.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £500.00k N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £50.00k N/A N/A £52.67k £69.99k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £132.00k N/A N/A £485.65k £356.39k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £821.00k N/A N/A £283.85k £421.95k
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.00k N/A N/A £19.41k £18.02k
Expenditure - Governance £50.00k N/A N/A £16.52k £14.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £771.00k N/A N/A £227.18k £363.47k
Expenditure - Investment management £12.00k N/A N/A £10.45k £10.11k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Long-term investments £986.00k N/A N/A £1.08m £1.13m
Other assets £708.00k N/A N/A £998.00k £1.21m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £751.00k N/A N/A £329.46k £339.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 July 2024 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 July 2024 173 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKENESS OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR ITS EFFECTS WHO MAY HAVE BEEN TREATED BY OR THROUGH THE SHERWOOD FOREST HOSPITALS TRUST OR ANY SUCCESSOR BODY
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Registration history
  • 18 January 2006 : Standard registration
  • 14 January 2022 : Removed
  • 14 January 2022 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
Kings Mill Hospital
Mansfield Road
Sutton-in-Ashfield
NG17 4JL
Phone:
01623622515
Website:

No information available