SENIORS HEALTH AND ACTIVE RETIREMENT PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide activities to maintain and enhance the physical and mental health of people aged 50 or more
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £30,410 from 1 government contract(s) and £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Hackney
Governance
- 15 April 1996: Standard registration
- 08 February 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1086812 THE SHOREDITCH TRUST
- THE SHARP END (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.88k | £54.80k | £58.76k | £82.51k | £61.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.47k | £75.72k | £59.92k | £53.72k | £65.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £30.41k | £30.41k | N/A | £30.41k | |
|
Income from government grants | £60.51k | N/A | N/A | £37.91k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND DECEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 13TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY, THE CITY OF LONDON AND THE ADJOINING BOROUGHS; AND TO RELIEVE THE ELDERLY, BEING PERSONS 60 YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER REGARDLESS OF RACE, RELIGION, DISABILITY, GENDER OR SEXUALITY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY, THE CITY OF LONDON AND THE ADJOINING BOROUGH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window