EYNSHAM AND LONG HANBOROUGH MEDICAL CARE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness of persons in the district of Eynsham and Long Hanborough, including patients of the Eynsham Medical Centre and Long Hanborough Surgery by the provisions of equipment and other amenities and generally to support any charitable work of the said Medical Centre and Surgery. Small financial grants may be available to residents of the parishes of Hanborough who are in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NEIL RUST | Chair | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Kyan Zarbalian | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Gundry | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Alexa Zhao | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Emma Ladds | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Clifford Francis Royal | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Dr Mohammed Amar Latif | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Nigel Knights-Johnson | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Breakspear | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DR Lorenz Kemper | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Jessica Ruth Harris | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr IAN BINNIAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr JEAN BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr David John Maxwell PETERSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | 30/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £1.70k | £2.19k | £8.79k | £1.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.53k | £14.41k | £9.66k | £9.91k | £7.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN THE DISTRICT OF EYNSHAM AND LONG HANBOROUGH, INCLUDING PATIENTS OF THE EYNSHAM AND LONG HANBOROUGH MEDICAL CENTRE BY THE PROVISIONS OF EQUIPMENT AND OTHER AMENITIES AND GENERALLY TO SUPORT ANY CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID MEDICAL CENTRE.
Area of benefit
EYNSHAM AND LONG HANBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eynsham Medical Centre
Conduit Lane
Eynsham
WITNEY
Oxfordshire
OX29 4QB
- Phone:
- 01865881206
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window