ST PAULINUS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education for children under statutory school age as per Ofsted regulations whilst encouraging parental participation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £42,203 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 18 April 1996: Standard registration
- ST. PAULINUS PRE-SCHOOL GROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Dodson | Chair | 06 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Samantha Leggett | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Barnes | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Robertson | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee Gasson | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ng | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
William STONE | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Michael Sinclair | Trustee | 06 February 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.20k | £53.80k | £54.59k | £37.53k | £53.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.97k | £44.83k | £59.36k | £45.75k | £49.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £49.63k | £45.58k | £28.44k | £42.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 3RD MARCH 2010 as amended on 20 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE IN A SECURE, FRIENDLY, ENCOURAGING ENVIRONMENT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH OFSTED REGULATIONS, FOLLOWING GOVERNMENTAL EDUCATION DEPARTMENT GUIDELINES AND BY... (SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION FOR FULL DETAILS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Paulinus Church Centre
Hillcrest Road
EDENBRIDGE
TN8 6JS
- Phone:
- 07796 795811
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window