THE SANCTUARY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion both within the UK and overseas. The provision of religious education and relief of poor, sick & disabled. The provision of activities for young people and services to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 15 May 1996: Standard registration
- 16 February 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1140592 EUROVANGELISM
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1136743 UNIVIDA
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 299128 UNITED CHRISTIAN BROADCASTERS LIMITED
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 298528 inHope (Bristol) Limited
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1125684 OPEN DOORS WITH BROTHER ANDREW
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1053055 MERCY SHIPS - U.K LTD
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1066905 CARE FOR THE FAMILY
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 287610 PREMIER CHRISTIAN MEDIA TRUST
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1064738 GFA World
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1156712 CITY CHURCH BRISTOL
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1062638 DISASTERS EMERGENCY COMMITTEE
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1166678 LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH BRISTOL
- 16 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1149601 ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH CENTRE LIMITED
- SANCTUARY CHURCH (Working name)
- THE SANCTUARY CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.84k | £68.57k | £66.41k | £47.76k | £29.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.12k | £67.37k | £71.83k | £57.83k | £50.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 09 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 09 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED DATED 5 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 27 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
A) THEADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WHETHER INTHE UK OR OVERSEAS B) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION C) THERELIEF OF AGED POOR SICK OR DISABLED
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window