NORFOLK FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1055410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Family History Society operating a library of Norfolk Genealogical Resources at Kirby Hall in Norwich, doing research, producing a quarterly magazine, The Norfolk Ancestor, and providing an online database for research purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £59,346
Total expenditure: £54,135

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Geoffrey Harper Trustee 13 April 2023
None on record
Belinda Broad Trustee 08 April 2021
None on record
CHARLES BUSH Trustee 11 February 2021
None on record
RICHARD ASHBERRY Trustee 19 November 2017
None on record
PHILIP JOHN WHISCOMBE Trustee 26 March 2014
WYMONDHAM DEMENTIA SUPPORT GROUP
Received: On time
CAROL GEORGINA REEVE Trustee 19 November 2012
None on record
CAROLE ANN TAYLOR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £53.88k £53.88k £56.96k £51.98k £59.35k
Total expenditure £72.74k £73.74k £50.56k £63.39k £54.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE NORFOLK FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY ("THE SOCIETY") BY MAKING PROVISION FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING:- (A) THE MAINTENANCE REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT (INCLUDING PROVISION FOR FUTURE MAINTENANCE REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT) OF THE LAND AND BUILDINGS COMPRISING THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS KIRBY HOUSE 38B ST GILES STREET NORWICH NR2 1LL AND/OR ANY REPLACEMENT PREMISES USED BY THE SOCIETY AS ITS HEADQUARTERS AND/OR LIBRARY PREMISES FROM TIME TO TIME ("KIRBY HOUSE") (B) PAYMENT ON BEHALF OF THE SOCIETY OF ANY SERVICE CHARGES OR OTHER CHARGES INCURRED BY THE SOCIETY IN CONNECTION WITH THE USE BY THE SOCIETY OF KIRBY HOUSE (2) IN THE EVENT THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE UNABLE TO APPLY ALL OR ANY OF THE INCOME DERIVING FROMT THE TRUST FUND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS SET OUT AT (1) THEN SUCH INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF THE SOCIETY WHICH IS IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OF BENEFIT TO THE SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 05 August 1996 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Kirby Hall
70 St Giles Street
Norwich
Norfolk
NR2 1LS
Phone:
01603763718