FRIENDS OF GREAT SHELFORD PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1055432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising to help maintain and improve the buildings and churchyard of Great Shelford Parish Church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,427
Total expenditure: £2,035

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert William Doel Chair 26 May 2021
None on record
John Francis Wilson Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Sheila Vaughan Sharrock Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Helen Lorraine Fowler Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
The Revd Dr Julie Mary Norris Trustee 29 September 2022
EASTERN REGION MINISTRY COURSE
Received: On time
Dr John Stanton Trustee 03 October 2021
None on record
Simon White Trustee 10 June 2021
None on record
Gillian Scahill Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Francis M Clifford Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Trevor Ronald Ward Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Meg Wilding Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Richard Graham Landon Trustee 07 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.42k £2.22k £4.10k £5.11k £6.43k
Total expenditure £5.40k £1.80k £5.15k £1.94k £2.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Coppice Avenue
Great Shelford
Cambridge
CB22 5AQ
Phone:
01223843146
Website:

No information available