HAMPSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE CARE OF THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wellbeing and emotional support, independent living aids and magnification equipment, grants, information advice and guidance, activities and services to sight impaired people in Hampshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,345 from 5 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
Governance
- 21 May 1996: Standard registration
- OPEN SIGHT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jane Brooks | Chair | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Oshallah | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Oliphant | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vivien Mary Robins | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hamblen | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Lynn Simpson | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Terri Georgina Howell | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Hildyard | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Reefat Drabu | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £351.76k | £136.61k | £253.56k | £273.41k | £164.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £427.78k | £382.49k | £428.76k | £469.35k | £451.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.70k | £2.50k | £450 | £3.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED 7 MAY 1996, 21 OCTOBER 2003, 18 OCTOBER 2007 AND 13 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED, SIGHT IMPAIRED AND OTHER PEOPLE, WHOSE SIGHT IS AT RISK, LIVING IN ENGLAND, WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THOSE IN HAMPSHIRE
Area of benefit
SOUTH OF ENGLAND, PRIMARILY HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 CHURCH ROAD
EASTLEIGH
HAMPSHIRE
SO50 6BL
- Phone:
- 02380641244
- Email:
- info@opensight.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window