Financial history ST. AUGUSTINE'S DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1055650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £51.03k £32.39k £40.26k £36.61k £0
Total expenditure £61.62k £35.08k £42.68k £45.05k £7.63k
Income from government contracts £26.83k N/A £27.05k £19.52k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £28.13k N/A N/A N/A