CORNWALL ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the society shall be to undertake and foster archaeological research in Cornwall (including The Isles Of Scilly) and to disseminate knowledge of cornish archaeology by publication or other means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
- Isles Of Scilly
Governance
- 29 May 1996: Standard registration
- C A S (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Charles Herring | Chair | 09 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Ben Sumpter | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles William Johns | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert Attwell | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Emma Eleanor Morris | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Miucci | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Ryan Gilkes | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNA MARGARET TYACKE | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Darling | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael George Efstathiou | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hartgroves | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Preston-Jones | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER SMITH | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hoskins | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE DUDLEY BA,FMA,OBE | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAIN ROWE | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KONSTANZE RAHN | Trustee | 12 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JENNY MOORE | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE WILSON | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.00k | £13.79k | £13.45k | £13.75k | £17.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.52k | £15.19k | £13.02k | £14.18k | £15.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED 7TH APRIL 2001 AND 3 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE AND FOSTER ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH IN CORNWALL (INCLUDING THE ISLES OF SCILLY) AND TO DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE OF CORNISH ARCHAEOLOGY BY PUBLICATION OR OTHER MEANS
Area of benefit
CORNWALL AND ISLES OF SCILLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 The Square
Tregony
TRURO
TR2 5RS
- Phone:
- 01726 850792
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window