GILBERT TRUST FOR THE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as guardian of the Gilbert collection, ensure its continued safekeeping and display the collection to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 04 June 1996: Standard registration
- HEATHER TRUST FOR THE ARTS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melissa Eileen Buron | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Caroline Nylsalie Jacobsen | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erica Boyer | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Levy FSA | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Tristram Julian William Hunt | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|||||
MARTIN BLANK JUNIOR | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR NICK HOFFMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ZIMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY MARJORIE GILBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.87k | £516 | £929 | £42 | £213.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £482.86k | £361.53k | £920.85k | £309.66k | £497.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 DECEMBER 2007 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 JULY 2009 as amended on 26 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND INFORM THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT ART AND ARTISTIC WORKS GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR ABOUT THE WORKS OF ART ACQUIRED BY THE COMPANY BY EXHIBITION AND INTERACTIVE DISPLAYS, BY PREPARATION OF CATALOGUES AND INVENTORIES, BY RESEARCH AND BY PUBLICATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS ARE APPROPRIATE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICTORIA & ALBERT MUSEUM
CROMWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW7 2RL
- Phone:
- 02079422771
- Email:
- gilbertcollection@vam.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window