THE DISCERNING EYE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to promote the artistic works of unknown artists and to offer prizes and busaries to further their artistic careers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Hall | Chair | 17 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Julian Wild RE | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tabish Khan | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Whitehead Claire | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adelaide Maami Abena Damoah | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Metcalf | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Giles Brown | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.36k | £101.42k | £207.37k | £221.37k | £207.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.35k | £87.22k | £170.28k | £168.30k | £169.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 28TH MARCH 1996.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE ORGANISING OF AN ANNUAL EXIBITION KNOWN AS THE DISCERNING EYE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Claremont Road
Claygate
ESHER
KT10 0PL
- Phone:
- 01372 469268
- Email:
- sarah.hall93@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window