Financial history EVANGELICAL CONCERN FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES.

Charity Number: 1056174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.50k £3.50k £8.00k £5.00k £7.00k
Total expenditure £2.25k £3.20k £7.50k £3.00k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A