THE CHRISTIAN CONFERENCE TRUST

Charity Number: 1056604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We promote the Christian faith by providing residential and day conference facilities at below commercial rates to Christian organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 October 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • C C T - HAYES CONFERENCE CENTRE - HIGH LEIGH CONFERENCE CENTRE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andy Lucas Chair 02 April 2020
None on record
Andrew Robert CAVE Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Rev DEREK MICHAEL TALBOT Trustee 11 April 2024
None on record
John Levick Trustee 19 October 2023
THE BAPTIST UNION CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Sharon Margaret Greasley Trustee 19 October 2023
GILLINGHAM BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
NICHOLAS LARKLAND BARNABY MYERS Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
Hayley Jayne BECKETT Trustee 15 April 2021
THE BAPTIST UNION CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
DIONNE GRAVESANDE Trustee 18 April 2018
RESTORED
Received: On time
THE M B RECKITT TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Howard Michael Page Trustee 06 April 2017
PARK ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, PETERBOROUGH
Received: On time
MICHAEL QUANTICK Trustee 12 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/10/2019 28/10/2020 28/10/2021 28/10/2022 28/10/2023
Total gross income £7.26m £3.23m £3.32m £7.10m £7.78m
Total expenditure £6.29m £5.24m £4.22m £7.19m £7.55m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £848.05k £303.50k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £940.51k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.84m £474.09k £688.55k £1.60m £1.91m
Income - Charitable activities £5.41m £1.91m £1.38m £5.51m £5.87m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.48k £3.19k £1 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £848.05k £303.50k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.93m £5.19m £4.15m £6.78m £7.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £364.26k £48.14k £65.87k £123.55k £295.41k
Expenditure - Governance £12.85k £22.98k £95.29k £97.01k £149.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £30.08k £59.37k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £295.38k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 28/10/2019 28/10/2020 28/10/2021 28/10/2022 28/10/2023
Own use assets £10.29m £12.04m £12.05m £12.16m £12.01m
Long-term investments £0 £110.36k £110.36k £0 £0
Other assets £4.59m £2.15m £2.62m £3.12m £2.97m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.33m £3.11m £4.19m £4.74m £4.20m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 October 2023 12 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 October 2023 12 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 October 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 October 2022 27 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 October 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 October 2021 20 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 October 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 October 2020 25 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 October 2019 07 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 October 2019 07 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Hayes Conference Centre
Swanwick
Alfreton
DE55 1AU
Phone:
03001114444