Financial history NORTH TEES AND HARTLEPOOL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1057682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £613.00k £706.00k £789.00k £703.00k £807.00k
Total expenditure £346.00k £447.00k £336.00k £378.00k £555.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £459.00k £563.00k £659.00k £568.00k £646.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £17.00k £43.00k £48.00k £62.00k
Income - Charitable activities £15.00k £20.00k £41.00k £31.00k £24.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £39.00k £40.00k £41.00k £41.00k £53.00k
Income - Other £100.00k £66.00k £5.00k £15.00k £22.00k
Income - Legacies £118.00k £16.00k £161.00k £0 £37.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £346.00k £435.00k £281.00k £288.00k £467.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £12.00k £55.00k £90.00k £88.00k
Expenditure - Governance £35.00k £37.00k £37.00k £41.00k £41.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0