ROYAL COLLEGE OF PAEDIATRICS AND CHILD HEALTH

Charity number: 1057744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The College aims to promote high quality, effective and efficient health services for children and young people, their parents and other carers, delivered by appropriately trained and experienced doctors. The College works with all health carers of children to improve the overall physical, mental and emotional health of children and young people in the UK and elsewhere.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Burma
  • Ghana
  • Ireland
  • Kenya
  • Nigeria
  • Northern Ireland
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Rwanda
  • Scotland
  • Sierra Leone
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 September 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COLLEGE OF PAEDIATRICS AND CHILD HEALTH (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
  • Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Homes England
  • Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
  • Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Mary Shaw Chair 01 November 2021
None on record
Iman Salah Osman Trustee 27 September 2024
None on record
James Andrew Siswick Trustee 05 August 2024
None on record
Dr Janet Alison Dudley Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Dr Alison Mary Steele Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
Taona Christopher Makunganya Trustee 05 September 2023
None on record
Dr Sunil Singh Bhopal Trustee 05 September 2023
FOUNDATION YEARS INFORMATION AND RESEARCH
Received: On time
Simon Christopher Meredith Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Dr Tsitsi Dadirai Chawatama-Kwambana Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Professor Stephen William Turner Trustee 31 March 2021
None on record
Professor Sir Terence John Stephenson Trustee 09 December 2020
None on record
Adam Igra Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Dr Bhanu Williams Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.90m £15.35m £16.35m £17.71m £17.62m
Total expenditure £16.68m £15.61m £14.60m £15.77m £19.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.21m £118.00k
Income from government grants £1.52m £973.40k £1.42m N/A £96.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.00k £510.00k £7.00k £276.00k £169.00k
Income - Other trading activities £504.00k £254.00k £267.00k £419.00k £764.00k
Income - Charitable activities £16.57m £13.97m £16.04m £16.96m £16.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £39.00k £49.00k £34.00k £58.00k £190.00k
Income - Other £774.00k £563.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £500.00k £0 £160.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.35m £13.79m £14.43m £15.51m £19.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £331.00k £162.00k £166.00k £252.00k £96.00k
Expenditure - Governance £31.00k £27.00k £21.00k £31.00k £17.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £88.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.00k £8.60k £13.91k £16.00k £12.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.66m £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £17.53m £17.42m £17.56m £17.33m £17.13m
Long-term investments £1.05m £1.10m £2.37m £2.29m £2.21m
Other assets £9.57m £8.83m £9.28m £10.71m £10.08m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £7.60m £7.03m £6.88m £6.27m £6.95m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 17 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 31 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH JANUARY 2001. AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 11 JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
"THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN IN COUNTRIES OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR IN POOR AND DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND THOSE COUNTRIES AFFECTED BY DISASTER, WAR OR FAMINE: TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR, BY SEEKING: 1. TO ADVANCE AND ART AND SCIENCE OF PAEDIATRICS. 2. TO RAISE THE STANDARD OF MEDICAL CARE PROVIDED TO CHILDREN. 3. TO EDUCATE AND EXAMINE THOSE CONCERNED WITH THE HELP OF CHILDREN. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (AND IN PARTICULAR MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS) IN CHILD HEALTH WHICH MEANS THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN, THE PREVENTION OF ILLNESS AND DISEASE IN CHILDREN AND SAFEGUARDING THEIR OPTIMAL DEVELOPMENT."
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 11 September 2001 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
ROYAL COLLEGE OF PAEDIATRICS &
CHILD HEALTH
5-11 THEOBALDS ROAD
LONDON
WC1X 8SH
Phone:
02070926000