DEVON COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1057923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

DCF is privileged to be working alongside people who are motivated by wanting to make a difference across Devon.We use our knowledge of local needs and the voluntary sector to manage the distribution of funds to achieve sustainable outcomes, awarding financial and other support on behalf of our partners and donors.In this way we address disadvantage and achieve inspiring change in our communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon
  • Plymouth City
  • Torbay

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dinah Cox Chair 11 February 2020
None on record
Cary Rudolph Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Sandra Goscomb Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Rowan Truscott Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Rev Georgina Margaret Radford Trustee 09 February 2021
ST LUKES COLLEGE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LITTLE HEMPSTON PARISH LANDS
Received: On time
PARISH LANDS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETROC'S SOUTH BRENT
Recently registered
Ann Holman Trustee 11 November 2020
DEVON AIR AMBULANCE TRUST
Received: On time
Sally Wace Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Caroline Harlow Trustee 29 November 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.27m £4.19m £2.16m £2.61m £2.53m
Total expenditure £1.72m £3.35m £2.64m £2.89m £2.95m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.09m £1.86m £1.42m £1.49m £898.91k
Income - Donations and legacies £463.45k £2.39m £1.24m £1.12m £1.25m
Income - Other trading activities £13.75k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.31m £1.56m £1.02m £1.23m £898.91k
Income - Endowments £43.15k £150.46k £351.69k £26.88k £14.35k
Income - Investment £224.69k £238.95k £239.64k £258.40k £390.10k
Income - Other £260.07k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.61m £3.23m £2.51m £2.80m £2.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £109.38k £121.94k £128.49k £96.59k £126.79k
Expenditure - Governance £7.01k £14.62k £19.60k £28.13k £15.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.20m £2.78m £2.03m £2.32m £2.34m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £269.20k £267.82k £281.52k £279.41k £272.29k
Long-term investments £7.08m £8.77m £9.72m £9.35m £10.09m
Other assets £1.98m £2.36m £1.99m £1.68m £1.51m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £499.94k £185.39k £292.28k £292.54k £529.07k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME SEALED 5 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE NORTH DEVON RELIEF FUND ARE THE OBJECTS IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHIN DEVON.
Area of benefit
AREA WITHIN NORTH DEVON AS BOUNDED BY A RED VERGE LINE ON THE MAP DEPOSITED AT THE COMMISSION IDENTIFIED BY NUMBER 27655
Registration history
  • 08 July 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE FACTORY
LEAT STREET
TIVERTON
EX16 5LL
Phone:
01884235887