SHERBROOK PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND - CANNOCK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports children with learning disabilities, allowing them to take part in extra curricular actvities not currently funded by the authority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 19 September 1996: Standard registration
- 26 September 2022: Funds received from 1109783 KIDS ADVENTUROUS ACTIVITIES
- 03 March 2025: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
- BEECROFT HILL SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.40k | £8.03k | £12.68k | £15.87k | £14.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.04k | £8.39k | £4.43k | £17.67k | £17.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 07 February 2025 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF SHERBROOK PRIMARY SCHOOL, CANNOCK, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window