Financial history THE LOIS CUMBERS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1058148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/07/2020 04/07/2021 04/07/2022 04/07/2023 04/07/2024
Total gross income £16.87k £8.23k £12.55k £13.63k £39.06k
Total expenditure £44.28k £10.00k £24.09k £5.48k £38.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A