THE LIBRARY AND MUSEUM CHARITABLE TRUST OF THE UNITED GRAND LODGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Library and Museum houses one of the worlds leading collections of Masonic books, artefacts and ephemera.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£610,144
Donations and legacies | £566.36k | |
Charitable activities | £11.91k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £23.82k | |
Other | £8.05k |
Total expenditure:
£844,163
Raising funds | £15.77k | |
Charitable activities | £820.77k | |
Other | £7.63k |
-£26,338 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £23.40k | |
Charitable expenditure | £820.77k |
People

7 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 October 1996: Standard registration
- THE LIBRARY AND MUSEUM OF FREEMASONRY (Working name)
- THE LIBRARY AND MUSEUM CHARITABLE TRUST OF THE BOARD OF GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE UNITED GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND . (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James WP Campbell | Chair | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Aspey | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
PHILIPPA JANE GLANVILLE | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Andrew Berman | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN RICHARD NIGEL FENTON | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.85m | £1.04m | £1.10m | £607.30k | £610.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.16m | £1.31m | £1.01m | £938.94k | £844.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £128.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.01m | £998.61k | £1.06m | £0 | £566.36k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £782.27k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.37k | £7.37k | £9.52k | £0 | £11.91k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £43.81k | £29.87k | £35.35k | £29.02k | £23.82k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.66k | £2.64k | £125 | £9.83k | £8.05k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.40m | £1.26m | £932.30k | £905.94k | £820.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £727.63k | £35.39k | £64.32k | £20.92k | £15.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.41k | £6.33k | £0 | £2.95k | £1.94k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £7.79k | £7.15k | £8.19k | £6.86k | £5.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £31.84k | £8.53k | £12.20k | £12.08k | £7.63k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £868.26k | £779.42k | £673.14k | £565.38k | £458.86k | |
|
Long-term investments | £920.45k | £1.05m | £1.15m | £731.71k | £634.56k | |
|
Other assets | £584.00k | £150.31k | £140.99k | £153.94k | £131.33k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£99.71k | -£297.27k | -£142.18k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £110.68k | £145.18k | £91.31k | £106.34k | £140.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST [1]. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE BELOW MENTIONED SUB-CLAUSE 3.2 TO PROVIDE MAINTAIN MANAGE UPKEEP AND IMPROVE A MUSEUM AND LIBRARY FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL AND TO COLLECT MAINTAIN PRESERVE CONSERVE DISPLAY AND MAKE AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATION THE ARCHIVES RECORDS PRINTED MATERIAL REGALIA JEWELS AND ARTEFACTS FREEMASONRY. [2]. TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COUNCIL MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT BUT SUBJECT TO SUCH APPROVALS OR OR CONSENTS AS MAY FOR THE TIME BEING BE PRESCRIBED BY LAW OR IN THE REGULATIONS HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF TWENTY-ONE YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MUSEUM OF FREEMASONRY
FREEMASONS HALL
60 GREAT QUEEN STREET
LONDON
WC2B 5AZ
- Phone:
- 02073959257
- Website:
-
museumfreemasonry.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window