FIND A VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Find A Voice supports people with severe communication difficulties that may require some form of augmentative and alternative communication, such as signing, symbols or a communication aid. Services provided are a loan resource library and outreach service to those living in Kent and Medway, symbol training, one-to-one ICT support for adults that have learning and/or communication disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Kent
Governance
- 16 October 1996: Standard registration
- 30 October 2023: Funds received from 1122466 EAST KENT STROKES
- KENT LANGUAGE AND COMMUNICATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Greg Steel | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Poile | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gina Louise Iliffe | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Roy Dyer | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.28k | £110.82k | £155.46k | £58.85k | £54.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.47k | £56.60k | £110.95k | £65.36k | £70.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 FEBRUARY 2001 AND 6 JULY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE WITH SPEECH, LANGUAGE AND COMMUNICATION DISABILITIES, AND WHERE THERE IS A NEED TO FAMILIES AND CARERS OF SUCH PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION, SUPPORT, ASSESSMENT, A RESOURCE LOAN LIBRARY OF EQUIPMENT, WITHIN THE COUNTY OF KENT; A) TO TAKE ALL MEASURES TO ASSIST PEOPLE WITH SPEECH, LANGUAGE AND COMMUNICATION DISABILITIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, FO FAR AS IT IS POSSIBLE, TO ACHIEVE SELF-DETERMINATION. B) TO PROVIDE, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE TRAINING CENTRES, AND OTHER RESOURCES APPROPRIATE TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE WITH SPEECH, LANGUAGE AND COMMUNICATION DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Find A Voice
49 Beaver Lane
Ashford
TN23 5NU
- Phone:
- 01233640443
- Email:
- speak@findavoice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window