CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)

Charity number: 1058718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of religion by promoting knowledge of the Catholic faith and its practice among both Catholics and Non Catholics via the circulation of books and publications.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £108,620
Total expenditure: £178,068

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • C T S (DIOCESE OF SALFORD) (Working name)
  • C.T.S. (DIOCESE OF SALFORD) (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bishop Arnold Chair 08 December 2014
THE ATLANTIC TRADING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
ST CUTHBERT'S COLLEGE USHAW
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES TOGETHER
Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN LANCASHIRE
Received: On time
Elizabeth Therese Lilley Trustee 30 May 2019
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
Eamonn ONeal OBE Trustee 27 February 2019
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
Brendan McCafferty Trustee 27 February 2019
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
Mary Hunter Trustee 31 May 2018
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
Rev Michael David Jones Trustee 31 May 2018
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
Peter Fahy Trustee 06 May 2016
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
BRERETON BIG LOCAL CIO
Received: 100 days late
ANAWIM - BIRMINGHAM’S CENTRE FOR WOMEN LIMITED
Received: On time
WE STAND TOGETHER
Received: On time
CARE OF POLICE SURVIVORS
Received: On time
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
EDWARD NALLY Trustee 06 May 2016
BLACKBURN CATHOLIC YOUTH CENTRE
Charity reporting is overdue by 218 days
BOLTON LADS AND GIRLS CLUB LIMITED
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
Rev CHRISTOPHER DAWSON Trustee 10 May 2013
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
Rev PETER HOPKINSON Trustee 10 May 2013
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Michael Cooke Trustee 24 October 2011
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £871.25k £90.49k £104.81k £105.35k £108.62k
Total expenditure £187.81k £114.20k £99.30k £129.76k £178.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £15.55k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £104.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £766.95k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £104.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £187.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 January 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE DIOCESE OF SALFORD
CATHEDRAL CENTRE
3 FORD STREET
SALFORD
M3 6DP
Phone:
01618172208