THE ISIS PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running Groups to support women with mental issues. Providing creche facilities for their children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 24 October 1996: Standard registration
- 22 November 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 22 November 2011: Funds transferred to 1139148 THE ISIS PROJECT FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN LIMITED
- THE ISIS CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.29k | £39.55k | £131.50k | £176.86k | £232.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.70k | £58.61k | £110.03k | £143.13k | £216.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 17 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 12 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 06 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 23 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 03 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 23 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 25 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 28 November 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED 30TH JULY 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT FOR WOMEN USERS OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THOSE WOMEN WHO HAVE SUFFERED MENTAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND CARE FOR THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN
Area of benefit
BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window