THE IDA CARROLL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDING CONCERTS, CONTRIBUTION TO THE COST OF THE PRODUCTION OF CD'S AND SUPPORTING CHILDREN UNDERGOING EDUCATION IN SPECIALIST MUSICAL ESTABLISHMENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 13 November 1996: Standard registration
- 09 January 2015: Funds received from 293615 THE IDA CARROLL DOUBLE BASS AWARD TRUST
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BRIERLEY TURNER | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
JOHN STEPHEN ECKERSLEY | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
John Phillips | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Peter Graham Lawson | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr PETER HICK | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Andrew Mayes | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
MICHAEL HANCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
Dr RONALD OWEN VASEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.09k | £23.17k | £28.51k | £26.62k | £29.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.53k | £27.14k | £46.37k | £45.33k | £86.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE WILL OF IDA CARROLL DATED 30 JUNE 1988 AND PROVEN BY GRANT OF PROBATE ON 27 DECEMBER 1995 AND AS AMENDED BY CODICIL TO THE WILL DATED 17 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY, PRACTICE, KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 PARSONAGE ROAD
STOCKPORT
SK4 4JR
- Phone:
- 01614324682
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window