THE FRIENDS OF HYLANDS HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Friends shall be the preservation and improvement of the listed building - Hylands House, Chelmsford - together with the associated park, for the benefit of the public and the promotion of its use by the public, through the activities of a group of friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
67 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 03 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Chris Rycroft | Chair | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan Michael Mayo | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Valerie Chiswell | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Nicholas Paul Wickenden MA,AMA,FSA | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD OSCROFT MBE | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Beryle May Cornell | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Ann Elizabeth Bell | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Cynthia Jacqueline Walker | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS ROS COLERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MR STAN KALUZA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.06k | £13.34k | £16.02k | £40.03k | £25.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.83k | £39.88k | £13.12k | £30.07k | £13.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH MARCH 1996 AND AMENDED 8TH DECEMBER 1996 as amended on 16 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FRIENDS SHALL BE THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE LISTED BUILDING-HYLANDS HOUSE, CHELMSFORD TOGETHER WITH ITS ASSOCIATED PARKS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AND THE PROMOTION OF ITS USE BY THE PUBLIC, THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF THE GROUP OF FRIENDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE MAINLY MID-ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 BRITTEN CRESCENT
CHELMSFORD
CM2 7ER
- Phone:
- 01245609508
- Email:
- linda.knock@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window