NEW ISRAEL FUND

Charity number: 1060081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

NEW ISRAEL FUND IS THE LEADING ORGANISATION STRENGTHENING DEMOCRACY AND EQUALITY IN ISRAEL. NIF HELPS DEVELOP ISRAEL'S CIVIL SOCIETY ON ISSUES INCLUDING SHARED SOCIETY, SOCIAL JUSTICE, MINORITY RIGHTS AND HUMAN RIGHTS. THIS IS ACHIEVED THROUGH GRANT-MAKING, ORGANIZATIONAL CAPACITY-BUILDING, AND DELIVERING PROJECTS. IN THE UK WE RUN EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES TO EDUCATE THE COMMUNITY ON THESE ISSUES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Israel
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 1997: Standard registration
  • 11 March 2025: Funds received from 266408 THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE COUNCIL FOR A BEAUTIFUL...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Noeleen Cohen Chair 30 April 2021
LONDON JEWISH FORUM
Received: On time
CITIZENS UK CHARITY
Received: On time
Elizabeth Harris-Sawczenko OBE Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
DARREN LEWIS Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Karen Kaufman Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Joel Rosen Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Edward Millett Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Anna Roiser Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Andrew Leek Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Alex Marcuson Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Dana Kohava Segal Trustee 02 February 2021
None on record
Martin Paisner CBE MA LLM Trustee 07 September 2020
THE STUART YOUNG FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MORRIS LEIGH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TRUSTEES OF THE LONDON CLINIC LIMITED
Received: On time
THE TRUST FOR THE STUDY OF SOCIAL TRAUMA AND THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SURVIVORS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ISRAEL CANCER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE MAURICE AND VIVIENNE WOHL PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
OHEL SARAH UK
Received: On time
THE LILY AND MARCUS SIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
TEALE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WEIZMANN INSTITUTE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DEVONSHIRE STREET CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PETER CRUDDAS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DENISE COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIR SIGMUND STERNBERG CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SHIRLEY YOUNG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SCHMIDT-BODNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HADASSAH MEDICAL RELIEF ASSOCIATION U.K.
Received: On time
THE RUTH AND JACK LUNZER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STELLA AND ALEXANDER MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SYBIL SHINE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
YONI JESNER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ROSENBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE AMERICAN JEWISH JOINT DISTRIBUTION COMMITTEE (UK ) TRUST
Received: On time
JANET WOLFSON DE BOTTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CISSIE ROSEFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BLUSTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE POTEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BARNETT AND SYLVIA SHINE NO 2 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ADLER TRUST
Received: On time
THE LATCHMAN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WOLFSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SHAARE ZEDEK UK
Received: On time
WORCESTER COLLEGE OXFORD ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARCUS MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Paul Amit Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
Suzanne Caroline Jacobs Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.54m £2.79m £2.49m £3.77m £4.09m
Total expenditure £2.63m £2.62m £2.83m £3.08m £4.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.67k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.53m £2.77m £2.48m £3.76m £4.06m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.17k £343 £69 £1.39k £9.85k
Income - Other £6.41k £16.67k £6.45k £13.78k £17.24k
Income - Legacies £17.37k £127.27k £22.18k £11.00k £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.49m £2.47m £2.63m £2.84m £3.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £138.41k £157.81k £200.43k £239.25k £228.33k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £11.88k £10.97k £18.78k £18.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.09m £2.09m £2.35m £2.42m £3.32m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £5.12k £4.17k £18.18k £8.77k £1.69k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £826.06k £957.33k £587.77k £1.30m £1.37m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £69.40k £36.91k £24.06k £34.24k £54.49k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
New Israel Fund
Third Floor
Star House
104-108 Grafton Road
LONDON
Phone:
02077242266