LEEDS INVOLVING PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support service users and carers, through involvement, to influence local health, social care and community services at a strategic level.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,103 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
1220 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 13 January 1997: Standard registration
- LEEDS INVOLVEMENT PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Garry Fitt | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Abraham | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Russell Williams | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Gill Rachel Keddie | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Margaret Fraser Wilkinson | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tessa Francis | Trustee | 04 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Prem Singh Duggal | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL LANDEY | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.99k | £202.77k | £322.91k | £402.58k | £276.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.99k | £190.83k | £266.33k | £396.33k | £261.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £46.67k | N/A | £206.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £46.67k | £8.49k | £3.13k | £2.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO HAVE PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL DISABILITIES OR WHO ARE IN SOME WAY DISADVANTAGED BY REASON OF THEIR HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE SUPPORT AND EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 5
Unity Business Centre
26 Roundhay Road
Leeds
West Yorkshire
LS7 1AB
- Phone:
- 01132374508
- Email:
- info@leedsinvolvement.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window